CA AB2054 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 8.5 (commencing with Section 8601) of Chapter 7 of Division 1 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Emergency services: community response: grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2054 Kamlager Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2054 Kamlager et al. By Wiener (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - AB 2054 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2054 Kamlager et al. By Wiener (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - AB 2054 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5347.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 4400.). |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4919.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8601 | New Code | See Bill Text |