CA AB2058 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17057.7 and 23610.6 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credits: low-income housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17057.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23610.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |