CA AB206 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 171, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 171, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3494.5 to the Civil Code, relating to public nuisance.
Title
Public nuisance: abatement: lead-based paint.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] |
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-15 - Assembly - AB 206 Chiu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB206 Chiu et al. By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - AB 206 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB206 Chiu et al. By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - AB 206 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 171, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-08-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2718.). |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2134.). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and EQ. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 917.) |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 3494.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |