CA AB2068 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 173, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 173, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18801, 18802, 18803, 18804, 18805, 18806, 18807, and 18808 of, and to amend the headings of Article 9 (commencing with Section 18801) and Article 9.5 (commencing with Section 18805) of Chapter 3 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Voluntary tax contributions: California Firefighters’ Memorial Voluntary Tax Contribution Fund: California Peace Officer Memorial Foundation Voluntary Tax Contribution Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2068 Petrie-Norris Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2068 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2068 Petrie-Norris Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2068 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2068 Petrie-Norris Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 173, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5325.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4376.). |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4725.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 9). |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18801 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18803 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18804 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18806 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18807 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18808 | Amended Code | Citation Text |