CA AB2077 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4029 and 4033 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to pharmacy.
Title
Pharmacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2077 SOLORIO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2077 Solorio By Emmerson (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2077 SOLORIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2077 Solorio By Emmerson (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2077 SOLORIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-13 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2010-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6779.) (Corrected September 9.) | |
2010-08-25 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6644.) | |
2010-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4824.) | |
2010-08-23 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to JR 61(b)(14). | |
2010-08-09 | In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-06-29 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |
2010-06-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2010-05-13 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-13 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 5. Page 5150.) | |
2010-05-11 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-10 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-05-06 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5). | |
2010-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-22 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 20). | |
2010-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |
2010-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. by unanimous consent. | |
2010-03-29 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-23 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |