CA AB2077 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3453.5 to the Penal Code, and to add Section 328 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to inmates.
Title
Postrelease community supervision: employment
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-05-09 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-19 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-03-12 | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and PUB. S. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 328 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 3453.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |