CA AB2077 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14005.37 of, and to add Section 15927 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public health.
Title
Health Care Eligibility, Enrollment, and Retention Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2077 BURKE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2077 Burke By Hernandez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2077 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2077 Burke By Hernandez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2077 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-24 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6554.). |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5417.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5166.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5172.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 27). |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15927 | New Code | See Bill Text |