CA AB2086 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11463 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Foster care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11463 | Amended Code | Citation Text |