CA AB2088 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-17 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-17 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 27 (commencing with Section 50301) to Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Wealth tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 50301 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2088 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2088 |