CA AB2105 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1370 and 1372 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: competence to stand trial.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1370 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1372 | Amended Code | Citation Text |