CA AB2110 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 32282 of, and to add Sections 32282.2 and 47606.1 to, the Education Code, relating to school safety.
Title
School safety: hate- and bias-related events.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 32282 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 32282.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 47606.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2110 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2110 |