CA AB2150 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 478, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 478, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 798.14 and 798.15 of the Civil Code, relating to mobilehomes.
Title
Mobilehome parks.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2150 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2150 Atkins By Negrete McLeod (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2150 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2150 Atkins By Negrete McLeod (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2150 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 478, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:25 a.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 11. Page 6314.). | |
2012-08-22 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4701.). | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-07-03 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-07-02 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). | |
2012-05-31 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-21 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 4919.) | |
2012-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-15 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-05-14 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |
2012-03-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 798.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 798.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |