CA AB2157 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 278, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 278, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1371.30 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10112.81 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: independent dispute resolution process.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2157 Wood By Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2157 Wood Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2157 Wood Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 278, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4294.). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 13). |
2020-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4726.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1371.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |