CA AB2193 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 46600, 48204.3, 49603, 66010.99, 66025.8, 68075, 69999.14, and 69999.16 of the Education Code, to amend Section 19771.5 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 51, 53, 54, 55, 120, 121, 142, 179, 213, 326, 328, 394, 395.9, 422, 502.1, 502.2, 512, 513, 515, 532, 550, 554, 560, 562, 612, 640, 642.5, 643.1, 643.2, 644, 648, 649, 850, 852, and 981.8 of the Military and Veterans Code, to amend Section 532b of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 17132.4 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to military and veterans.
Title
Military: State Guard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2193 V.A (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2193 V. A. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2193 V. A. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4374.). |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4675.) |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |