CA AB2203 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-09 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-09 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1367.51 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10176.61 of the Insurance Code, relating to health insurance.
Title
Insulin cost-sharing cap.
Sponsors
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] | Asm. Shirley Weber [D] |
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2203 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 4. Page 4705.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10176.61 | Amended Code | Citation Text |