CA AB2213 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 98, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 98, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8593.3 and 8593.4 of, and to add Sections 8589.65 and 8593.5 to, the Government Code, and to amend Section 10850.9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Office of Emergency Services: planning guidance: telecommunications.
Sponsors
Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Asm. Christy Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2213 Limón Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2213 Limón et al. By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2213 Limón Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2213 Limón et al. By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2213 Limón Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 98, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5384.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4758.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 12). |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8589.65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8593.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8593.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8593.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10850.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |