CA AB2219 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 24950.5 and 24976 of the Education Code, relating to individual retirement plans, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
State Teachers’ Retirement System: individual retirement plans: administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 24950.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 24976 | Amended Code | Citation Text |