CA AB2229 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1522, 1568.09, 1569.17, and 1596.871 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to care facilities.
Title
Presence at care facilities: conviction of crimes.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1522 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1568.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1596.871 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2229 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2229 |