CA AB2231 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1720 of the Labor Code, relating to public works.
Title
Public works.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-26 - Assembly - AB 2231 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2231 Kalra By Monning (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2231 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2231 Kalra By Monning (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2231 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 14. Page 5226.). |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 4298.). |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 4689.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (June 2). |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-05-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1720 | Amended Code | Citation Text |