CA AB2253 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 279, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 279, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1277 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 5068.5 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 5751.2 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to professional licensure.
Title
Professional licensure.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2253 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2253 Low Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2253 Low Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 279, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4374.). |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 1). |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4723.) |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 21). |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1277 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 5068.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5751.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |