CA AB2278 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 124130 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Lead screening.
Sponsors
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] |
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 124130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2278 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2278 |