CA AB228 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 26003 to the Business and Professions Code, and to add Sections 109950.5, 110382, 110407, 110469, 110611, and 111691 to, and to add Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 111920) to Part 5 of Division 104 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to industrial hemp, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Food, beverage, and cosmetic adulterants: industrial hemp products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 228 Aguiar-Curry Third Reading Urgency (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 228 Aguiar-Curry Third Reading Urgency (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1788.). |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 17. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26003 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 109950.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 110382 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 110407 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 110469 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 110611 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 111691 | New Code | See Bill Text |