CA AB2342 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 1.4 (commencing with Section 3007.5) to Chapter 8 of Title 1 of Part 3 of the Penal Code, relating to parole.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parole.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2342 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2342 McCarty et al. By Bradford (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 2342 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30 Vetoed by Governor.
2020-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5426.).
2020-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 5.).
2020-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-25SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
2020-08-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4856.)
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4747.)
2020-06-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 7.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2020-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2020-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code3007.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback