CA AB2360 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-26 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-26 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.626 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.868 to the Insurance Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Telehealth: mental health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2360 Maienschein Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2360 Maienschein By Mitchell (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2360 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2360 Maienschein By Mitchell (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2360 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-26 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 5349.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 4401.). |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 1). |
2020-07-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 12. Page 4762.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2020-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.626 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.868 | New Code | See Bill Text |