CA AB2377 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 146, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 146, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1562.2 of, and to add Sections 1509.56, 1562.1, 1562.15, and 1568.023 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health and care facilities.
Title
Residential facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2377 Chiu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2377 Chiu et al. By Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2377 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2377 Chiu et al. By Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2377 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 146, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5386.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 6. Page 4764.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2020-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1509.56 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1562.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1562.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1562.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1568.023 | New Code | See Bill Text |