CA AB2380 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 636, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 636, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 4.5 (commencing with Section 14865) to Division 12 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to fire protection.
Title
Fire protection: privately contracted private fire prevention resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2380 Aguiar-Curry Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2380 Aguiar-Curry By Wiener (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2380 AGUIAR-CURRY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2380 Aguiar-Curry By Wiener (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2380 AGUIAR-CURRY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 636, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6139.). |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 5851.) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and N.R. & W. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5421.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | (pending re-referral to Com. on NAT. RES.) |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4674.) |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and NAT. RES. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 13050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 14865 | New Code | See Bill Text |