CA AB2387 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-30 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5340.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12301.1 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to in-home supportive services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In-home supportive services: needs assessment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2387 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2387 Grayson By Beall (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2387 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-30 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5340.).
2020-09-26 Vetoed by Governor.
2020-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0.).
2020-08-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-11SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 10).
2020-07-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4814.)
2020-05-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7).
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-02-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2020-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2020-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code12301.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback