CA AB239 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 83, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 83, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 78261.5 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: registered nursing programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB239 Salas By Hurtado (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - AB 239 Salas Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - AB 239 Salas Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 83, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1873.). |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 918.) |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78261.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |