CA AB240 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 61, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 61, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1012, 1023, 1025, and 1043 of, and to add Sections 1023.1 and 1023.2 to, the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans’ homes.
Title
Veterans’ homes: lease of property.
Sponsors
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Asm. William Brough [R] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Asm. Randy Voepel [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 240 Irwin Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB240 Irwin et al. By Archuleta (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 240 Irwin Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB240 Irwin et al. By Archuleta (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 240 Irwin Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 61, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5334.). |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4350.). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Archuleta. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and G.O. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1473.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 1012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 1023 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 1023.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 1023.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 1025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 1043 | Amended Code | Citation Text |