CA AB2438 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 27, 30, 211, 655, 4083, 4372, 4857, 5070, 5070.5, 5079, 6001, 6026.11, 6056, 6060.2, 6060.25, 6086.1, 6086.5, 6090.6, 6168, 6200, 6232, 6234, 7071.18, 7125, 9882.6, 10083.2, 10141.6, 10166.07, 10166.11, 10232.2, 11317.2, 17594, 19819, 19821, 22954, 22979.4, 25205, 26067, and 26162 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 1670.9, 1798.3, 1798.24, 1798.29, 1798.70, 1798.75, 1798.82, 1798.85, 1899.5, 1947.8, 3426.7, 5405, and 6760 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 130, 425.16, and 1985.4 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 25247 and 28106 of the Corporations Code, to amend Sections 5091, 17250.25, 17611, 24214.5, 26812, 33133, 33353, 35147, 44438, 49006, 49060, 49562, 54004.1, 67380, 67383, 72695, 72696, 72701, 76060.5, 87102, 89307, 89573, 89574, 89915.5, 89916, 89919, 92955, 92956, 92961, and 99162 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 2166.7, 2194, 2194.1, 2227, 2267, 9002, 11301, 13300.7, 13311, 17200, 17400, 18109, 18650, and 23003 of the Elections Code, to amend Section 1157.7 of the Evidence Code, to amend Sections 17212 and 17514 of the Family Code, to amend Sections 12104, 14257, 18394, 22067, 22375, 22380, 23049, 31111, and 50314 of the Financial Code, to amend Sections 2584 and 9002.5 of the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 4061, 9269, 13134, 14022, 14407, 15205, 29041, 46013.2, 46014.1, 46029, 55075, 58577, 71089, 77965, 78925, and 79505 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 925.6, 1363, 3105, 3558, 5872, 5976, 6204, 6204.1, 6204.2, 6204.3, 6527, 7283.1, 7284.6, 7514.7, 8201.5, 8545, 8585, 8587.11, 8589.5, 8592.45, 11015.5, 11018.5, 11104.5, 11124.1, 11125.1, 11126, 11126.1, 11146.2, 11549.3, 12019.45, 12019.55, 12172.5, 12237, 12271, 12419.10, 12525, 12525.5, 12811.3, 12894.5, 15570.42, 15650, 15652, 15705, 20057, 22854.5, 24102, 25124, 26908.5, 27394, 36525, 52054, 53087.8, 53170, 53232.3, 53235.2, 53237.2, 53359.7, 53398.51.1, 53753, 53755.5, 53760.9, 54953, 54953.5, 54956.9, 54957.2, 54957.5, 60201, 62001, 62262, 63048.63, 65913.4, 66024, 66201, 66704.3, and 100508 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1255.7, 1280.20, 1368, 1371.31, 1380, 1382, 1385.07, 1397.5, 1399.72, 1399.74, 1416.28, 1439, 1457, 1536, 1776.6, 1798.200, 1798.201, 1799.112, 11605, 25152.5, 25186.5, 25200.3, 25201.10, 25201.11, 25205.13, 25214, 25214.8.5, 25214.17, 25257, 25358.7, 25501, 25512, 25538, 25968, 34191.55, 39660, 40440.5, 40440.7, 42303.2, 44346, 51615, 57020, 101661, 101848.2, 101848.9, 101850, 101855, 102100, 102230, 102231, 105459, 110845, 111792, 115000.1, 116787, 120160, 123853, 125191, 125290.30, 125290.50, 125342, 127673, 128735, 128736, 128737, 128745, 130060, 130506, and 131052 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 791.13, 922.41, 923.6, 925.3, 929.1, 935.8, 936.6, 1215.8, 1666.5, 1861.07, 1871.1, 10112.82, 10113.2, 10181.7, 10489.15, 10489.99, 11785, 11873, 12921.2, and 12968 of the Insurance Code, to amend Sections 138.7, 147.2, 432.3, 1776, 2810, 4600.5, 4610, 6322, 6396, and 7873 of the Labor Code, to amend Sections 55 and 56 of the Military and Veterans Code, to amend Sections 146e, 186.34, 290.07, 290.46, 293, 293.5, 637.5, 679.03, 832.5, 832.7, 832.18, 936.7, 1524.4, 5058, 6126.3, 7443, 11167.5, 13300, 13302, 13519.4, 13650, 14029, and 14167 of the Penal Code, to amend Sections 2602, 6703, 6824, 10191, 10335, 10506.6, 10506.9, 20101, 20119.3, 20155.3, 20665.24, 20919.24, 20928.2, and 22164 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 2207, 3160, 3234, 3752, 4604, 5080.24, 5080.25, 5096.512, 5096.513, 14551.4, 14554, 21082.3, 21089, 21160, 21167.6.2, 25223, 25322, 25402.10, 26213, 29754, 40062, 41821.5, 41821.6, 42036.4, 42987.3, and 48704 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 345.5, 349.5, 399.25, 743.3, 3328, 6354, 7665.4, 9614, 9618, 28844, 99246, 130051.28, 132354.1, 132360.5, and 132660 of the Public Utilities Code, to amend Sections 408.2, 408.3, 409, 7284.6, 7284.7, 7284.10, 18410.2, 19195, and 19528 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 36612 and 36740 of the Streets and Highways Code, to amend Section 10205 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, to amend Sections 12801.9, 21362.5, 21455.5, and 40240 of the Vehicle Code, to amend Sections 5206, 6102.5, 6161, 10730.8, and 81671 of the Water Code, and to amend Sections 827.9, 1764, 4712.5, 11478.1, 13302, 14005.27, 14087.5, 14087.36, 14087.58, 14087.98, 14089, 14089.07, 14105.8, 14105.22, 14105.33, 14105.45, 14107.11, 14124.24, 14129.2, 14167.37, 14301.1, 14456.3, 14499.6, 15805, 16809.4, and 17852 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public records.
Title
California Public Records Act: conforming revisions.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2438 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2438 |