CA AB2442 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 22.4 (commencing with Section 22595) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to false information.
Title
Social media platforms: false information.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2442 Chau Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 4820.) |
2020-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 27). |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22595 | New Code | See Bill Text |