CA AB2445 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 51, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 51, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 377.60 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Civil actions: wrongful death.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2445 Reyes Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2445 Reyes By Hertzberg Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2445 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2445 Reyes By Hertzberg Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2445 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 51, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5341.). |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4350.). |
2020-08-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-07-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 30). |
2020-07-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4681.) |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 27). |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 377.60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |