CA AB2453 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53115.1 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Emergency services: State 911 Advisory Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Rodriguez. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 30). |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53115.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |