CA AB2463 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12659.1 to the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water: plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 12659.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 85320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |