CA AB2463 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 218, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 218, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 703.150 and 704.760 of, and to add Section 699.730 to, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Enforcement of money judgments: execution: homestead.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2463 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments By STONE (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2463 Wicks By Monning (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2463 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2463 Wicks By Monning (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2463 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 218, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 5348.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4399.). |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4819.) |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 27). |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 699.730 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 703.150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 704.760 | Amended Code | Citation Text |