CA AB2483 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 4018.3 of the Penal Code, relating to county jails.
Title
County jails: recidivism: reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2483 Bauer-Kahan By Portantino (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2483 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2483 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2020-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 4401.). |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4798.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 4018.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |