CA AB2539 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 907, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 907, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 114349 and 114371 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to certified farmers' markets.
Title
Certified farmers' markets.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2539 TING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2539 Ting By Monning (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2539 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2539 Ting By Monning (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2539 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 907, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 6525.). |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4837.). |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 18). |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 5017.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 14). |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (April 29). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 114349 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 114365.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 114371 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |