CA AB2544 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 494, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 494, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 40220 of, and to add and repeal Section 40220.5 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Parking penalties.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2544 LACKEY Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2544 Lackey et al. By Wiener Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 2544 LACKEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2544 Lackey et al. By Wiener Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 2544 LACKEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 494, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6508.). |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5458.). |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | (Received pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14).) |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2018-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4790.) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11). |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 40220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40220.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |