CA AB2551 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-30 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-30 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5090.42 to the Public Resources Code, relating to parks and recreation.
Title
Off-highway vehicular recreation: Carnegie State Vehicular Recreation Area: Alameda-Tesla Expansion Area.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and A. & A.R. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5090.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2551 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2551 |