CA AB2570 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12650, 12651, 12652, and 12653 of the Government Code, relating to the False Claims Act.
Title
False Claims Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2570 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 20. Page 4768.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and REV. & TAX. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12650 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12651 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12652 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12653 | Amended Code | Citation Text |