CA AB2661 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
Pending: Assembly Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
Pending: Assembly Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 100061 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority: board of directors.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 100061 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2661 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2661 |