CA AB2709 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 37202, 46114, 46117, and 46118 of, to amend and repeal Sections 8973, 46111, and 46119 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 46112 of, the Education Code, relating to kindergarten.
Title
Full-day kindergarten.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 37202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 46111 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 46112 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 46114 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 46117 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 46118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 46119 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8973 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2709 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2709 |