CA AB272 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 42, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 42, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 48901.7 to the Education Code, relating to pupils.
Title
Pupils: use of smartphones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB272 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 272 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 272 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 42, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1607.). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1466.) |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-01-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 24. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48901.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |