CA AB2747 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 913, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 913, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 56.06, 1633.3, 1936, and 1942.2 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 415.46, 1174.25, 1174.3, 1501.5, 1571, and 2025.510 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 912, 917, and 1038.2 of the Evidence Code, to amend Section 504 of the Family Code, to amend Sections 831.7, 6103, 8214.15, 60371, 68085.1, 68631, and 68632 of, to add Section 68631.5 to, and to repeal Section 1456 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 1569.698 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 11163.3 of the Penal Code, to amend Sections 1513.1, 1811, 1812, 1813, 1851.5, 2356.5, 6401, and 6402 of the Probate Code, to amend Section 21189.2 of the Public Resources Code, and to repeal Chapter 4.2 (commencing with Section 10830) of Part 2 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to civil law.
Title
Civil law: omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. Roger Dickinson [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2747 JUD. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2747 Committee on JUD. (Wieckowski) By Jackson (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2747 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2747 Committee on JUD. (Wieckowski) By Jackson (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2747 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 913, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled measure version corrected. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6529.). |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4819.). |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2014-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 5107.) |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 21). |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-03-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 4. |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |