CA AB2764 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1367.65 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10123.81 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: mammography.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Health (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Health (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 31). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 11345 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |