CA AB2770 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 559 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employee wages and working hours: violators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2770 Monning Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2770 Monning By DeSaulnier (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2770 MONNING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-30 Vetoed by Governor.
2010-09-13 Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2010-08-30 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 6876.)
2010-08-25 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 3. Page 4865.)
2010-08-18 Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2010-08-17 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12).
2010-08-02 In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2010-06-24 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23).
2010-06-10 Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2010-06-01 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2010-06-01 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 5415.)
2010-05-28 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
2010-05-05 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2010-04-22 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 21).
2010-04-14 Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2010-04-13 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2010-03-25 Referred to Com. on L. & E.
2010-03-02 From printer. May be heard in committee April 1.
2010-03-01 Read first time. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2770&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_bill_20100301_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_bill_20100413_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_bill_20100818_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_bill_20100910_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20100421_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20100528_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20100601_0327PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20100623_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20100802_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20100812_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20100825_1115AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20100830_0839PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback