CA AB2770 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 22972, 22973, 22973.3, and 22977.1 of, and to add Sections 22990.5 and 22990.7 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to cigarette and tobacco product licensing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cigarette and tobacco product licensing: fees and funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2770 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2770 Nazarian By Beall (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2770 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2016.
2016-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2016-09-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2016-08-31AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 30). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6544.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 6551.).
2016-08-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2016-08-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2016-08-17SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5048.).
2016-08-15SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-11SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
2016-08-01SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-16SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2016-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2016-05-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 26. Page 4955.)
2016-05-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 18).
2016-05-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-05-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2016-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 8.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-03-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2016-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2016-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2016-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2770&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_bill_20160219_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_bill_20160512_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_bill_20160616_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_bill_20160815_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_bill_20160902_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_bill_20160927_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20160420_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20160518_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20160527_1022AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20160627_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20160801_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20160811_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20160817_1050AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20160830_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2751-2800/ab_2770_vote_20160831_0357PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback