CA AB2772 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 51226.8 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: ethnic studies: grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2772 MEDINA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2772 Medina et al. By Mitchell (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2772 MEDINA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2772 Medina et al. By Mitchell (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2772 MEDINA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 12. Page 7006.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 5954.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 5493.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 25). |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 21). |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51225.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51226.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51226.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |