CA AB2782 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 35, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 35, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 798.56 of, and to amend and repeal Section 798.17 of, the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 65863.7 and 66427.4 of the Government Code, relating to mobilehomes.
Title
Mobilehome parks: change of use: rent control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2782 Mark Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2782 Mark Stone et al. By Umberg (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2782 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2782 Mark Stone et al. By Umberg (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2782 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 35, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-08-31 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 16. Page 5451.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 13). |
2020-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 20. Page 4755.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 2). |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 798.17 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 798.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65863.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 66427.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |