CA AB2788 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 188, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 188, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1798.98 of the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 8380 and 8381 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Public utilities: cooperation with immigration authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2788 Gloria Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2788 Gloria et al. By Rubio (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2788 Gloria Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2788 Gloria et al. By Rubio (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2788 Gloria Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 188, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 5390.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 4683.) |
2020-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and JUD. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8380 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8381 | Amended Code | Citation Text |